DC B25-0119 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The Bill is now referred as follows: Sec. 5 to the Committee on Housing until September 30, 2023, the entire bill (without having to wait for the Committee on Housing) to the Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and then the entire bill to the Committee of the Whole. As introduced Bill 25-119 would create the Healthy Homes Program to install electric appliances for low and moderate income households. It would increase permit fees for installing appliances that use fossil fuels on site. Among other things, it would prohibit the District of Columbia Housing Authority from installing appliances or other systems that combust fossil fuels on site when making a conversion through the Rental Assistance Demonstration Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy Homes and Residential Electrification Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-04-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-04-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-03-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing
2023-03-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing
2023-02-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0119 Published in the DC Register
2023-02-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2023-02-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback