DC B25-0096 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Law L25-0006, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008445, Expires on Jan 05, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Law L25-0006, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008445, Expires on Jan 05, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Temporary Act of 2023
Title
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Temporary Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Council | Law L25-0006, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008445, Expires on Jan 05, 2024 |
2023-04-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-03-31 | Council | Act A25-0054 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003787 |
2023-03-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-03-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0054 |
2023-03-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0096 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | First Reading |
2023-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |