DC B25-0071 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0121, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001846
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0121, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001846
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-71 would establish that the CBE requirements associated with Lots 824 and 826 in Square 2950 apply to the gross project spend goal for the full Children’s National Research and Innovation Campus redevelopment project. It would also require the health care provider to pay the District the sum proportionate to the difference between the project goal and its actual CBE expenditure during the timeframe of the project if it fails to meet its CBE spend goal.
Title
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Council | Law L25-0121, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001846 |
2024-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-12-29 | Council | Act A25-0329 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016568 |
2023-12-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-12-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0329 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 21, 2023 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-10-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-10-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0071 |
2023-10-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-05-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-25 | Council | Public Hearing Cancelled |
2023-04-24 | Council | Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed |
2023-04-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-02-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0071 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |