DC B25-0070 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Law L25-0058, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013069
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Law L25-0058, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013069
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Augustine School Way Designation Act of 2023
Title
St. Augustine School Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-06 | Council | Law L25-0058, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013069 |
2023-08-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-08-04 | Council | Act A25-0185 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010709 |
2023-08-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-07-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0185 |
2023-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-06-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-06-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0070 |
2023-03-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0070 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |