DC B25-0064 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Act A25-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002664, Expires on May 24, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Act A25-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002664, Expires on May 24, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification to Human Care Agreement No. CW100382 with Community Connections Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Modification to Human Care Agreement No. CW100382 with Community Connections Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Council | Act A25-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002664, Expires on May 24, 2023 |
2023-02-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-02-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0021, Expires on May 24, 2023 |
2023-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |