DC B25-0050 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-50 would create an embalmer’s license and amend the requirements for a funeral director’s license. It would also establish requirements for a funeral directing or embalming internship.
Title
Funeral Directors Licensing Reform Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-01-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-01-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0050 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0050 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52110/Introduction/B25-0050-Introduction.pdf |