DC B25-0023 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Law L25-0010, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008834
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Law L25-0010, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008834
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-23 would symbolically designate the 500 block of 55th Street, N.E. as Woodson Way.
Title
Woodson Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] |
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Council | Law L25-0010, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008834 |
2023-05-05 | Council | Act A25-0082 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006323 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-04-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-04-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0082 |
2023-04-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-03-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-03-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0023 |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0023 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |