DC B25-0004 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Law L25-0009, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008833
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Law L25-0009, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008833
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Act of 2023
Title
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Council | Law L25-0009, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008833 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-04-28 | Council | Act A25-0067 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006095 |
2023-04-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-04-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0067 |
2023-04-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-03-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-02-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-02-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0004 |
2023-02-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0004 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |