DC B24-1094 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Act of 2022
Title
General Obligation Bonds and Bond Anticipation Notes for Fiscal Years 2023-2028 Authorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-11-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1094 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-1094 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51630/Introduction/B24-1094-Introduction.pdf |