DC B24-1087 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makiyah Wilson Way Designation Act of 2022
Title
Makiyah Wilson Way Designation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1087 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-10-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-1087 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51597/Introduction/B24-1087-Introduction.pdf |