DC B24-1042 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-11 - Act A24-0626 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014019, Expires on Feb 01, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-11 - Act A24-0626 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014019, Expires on Feb 01, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0626 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014019, Expires on Feb 01, 2023 |
2022-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-03 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0626, Expires on Feb 01, 2023 |
2022-10-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 10, 2022 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-10-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |