DC B24-1010 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0648 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014648 |
2022-11-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0648 |
2022-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2022 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | First Reading |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |