DC B24-1006 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-11 - Act A24-0590 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013910, Expires on Jan 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-11 - Act A24-0590 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013910, Expires on Jan 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0590 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013910, Expires on Jan 23, 2023 |
2022-10-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0590, Expires on Jan 23, 2023 |
2022-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |