DC B24-0980 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0228, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000024, Expires on Aug 03, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0228, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000024, Expires on Aug 03, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council Vaccination Policy Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Council Vaccination Policy Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0228, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000024, Expires on Aug 03, 2023 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0617 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013989 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-01 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0617 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading |
2022-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |