DC B24-0977 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 30 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-21 - Act A24-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012718, Expires on Jan 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 30 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-21 - Act A24-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012718, Expires on Jan 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Act A24-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012718, Expires on Jan 15, 2023 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-17 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0584, Expires on Jan 15, 2023 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 17, 2022 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |