DC B24-0953 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Malcolm X Surplus Declaration and Disposition Approval Act of 2022
Title
Malcolm X Surplus Declaration and Disposition Approval Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0953 |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0953 |
2022-11-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-11-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0953 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |