DC B24-0947 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proactive Inspection Program Act of 2022
Title
Proactive Inspection Program Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-08-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0947 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0947 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51063/Introduction/B24-0947-Introduction.pdf |