DC B24-0946 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Eliminating Restrictive and Segregated Enclosures ("ERASE") Solitary Confinement Act of 2022
Title
The Eliminating Restrictive and Segregated Enclosures ("ERASE") Solitary Confinement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs |
2022-09-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0946 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0946 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51062/Introduction/B24-0946-Introduction.pdf |