DC B24-0938 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-938 would direct the Department of Energy and Environment to treat electricity generated by rooftop community renewable energy facilities for purposes of evaluating a building’s compliance with the Building Energy Performance Standards.
Title
Building Energy Performance Standards CREF Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0938 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0938 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/50031/Introduction/B24-0938-Introduction.pdf |