DC B24-0936 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0551 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009997, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0551 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009997, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Support Remote Cooperative Association Meetings Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Coronavirus Support Remote Cooperative Association Meetings Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0551 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009997, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0551, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |