DC B24-0933 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunshine in Litigation Act of 2022
Title
Sunshine in Litigation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0933 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0933 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/50014/Introduction/B24-0933-Introduction.pdf |