DC B24-0928 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0549 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009993, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Act A24-0549 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009993, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW95405 with Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Contract No. CW95405 with Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0549 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009993, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0549, Expires on Oct 25, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |