DC B24-0893 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-893 would reform the Rapid Re-Housing Program so individuals and families do not pay more than 30% of their income toward rent. Participants would be assessed for the receipt of permanent housing vouchers and it would also establish eligibility and prioritization criteria for Targeted Affordable Housing vouchers.
Title
Rapid Re-Housing Reform Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0893 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0893 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49917/Introduction/B24-0893-Introduction.pdf |