DC B24-0889 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0188, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011958, Expires on May 04, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0188, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011958, Expires on May 04, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing Care for Healthcare Providers Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Continuing Care for Healthcare Providers Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0188, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011958, Expires on May 04, 2023 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0534 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009944 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0534 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0889 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |