DC B24-0880 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | Council | Postponed Indefinitely |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0880 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |