DC B24-0866 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-866 would provide that the award of compensation under the workers’ compensation law of any other state shall not bar a claim for compensation under the District’s workers’ compensation law for the same injury or death provided that the District’s compensation award shall be reduced by the amount of compensation awarded under the law of any other state.
Title
Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0866 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2022-06-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0866 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49793/Introduction/B24-0866-Introduction.pdf |