DC B24-0865 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-865 would create a Commission on Re-Entry Services for Women (CRSW). The CRSW would identify specific services that address the physical, emotional, and psychological challenges women face prior, during, and after incarceration; and required for successful re-entry and reintegration. Among other things, the CRSW would examine workforce development, education, and housing opportunities that are tailored to returning women.
Title
Commission on Re-Entry Services for Women Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0865 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2022-06-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0865 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49792/Introduction/B24-0865-Introduction.pdf |