DC B24-0823 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-823 would provide a property tax abatement to the real property designated for tax purposes as Lot 805, Square 3087, located at 206 Elm Street, N.W. provided that the total abatement shall not exceed $30,000, during tax year 2023.
Title
206 Elm St. N.W. Real Property Tax Abatement Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-16 | Council | Act A24-0681 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015086 |
2022-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-08 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0681 |
2022-11-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2022 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading |
2022-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0823 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0823 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-05-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |