DC B24-0798 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-798 would provide a real property tax exemption for real property belonging to Qualified Low Income Community Businesses that participate in transactions qualifying for the New Markets Tax Credit provided under the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
New Markets Tax Credit Real Property Tax Exemption Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-16 | Council | Act A24-0680 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015084 |
2022-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0680 |
2022-11-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2022 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0798 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0798 Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-04-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |