DC B24-0785 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-785 would require that construction of new or substantially improved buildings that the District owns or finances adhere to net zero energy standards and not incorporate fossil fuel consumption. It would codify the Sustainability and Energy Division of the Department of General Services (DGS). It requires DGS to procure periodic net zero energy construction and maintenance training for facilities staff, certified business enterprises, and interested parties. Among other things it would give net zero energy ready, fossil fuel free buildings priority consideration for the District government’s facility needs.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Greener Government Buildings Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0755 |
2022-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2022-12-01 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-12-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0785 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0785 |
2022-10-20 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0785 Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2022-04-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |