DC B24-0758 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-758 would bar the sale of new fur products in the District by outlawing the sale of such products within the District and prohibiting DC-based sellers from selling such products anywhere.
Title
Fur Products Prohibition Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0758 Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0758 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49258/Introduction/B24-0758-Introduction.pdf |