DC B24-0745 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0140, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008344, Expires on Feb 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0140, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008344, Expires on Feb 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lead Service Line Planning Task Force Interagency Plan Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Lead Service Line Planning Task Force Interagency Plan Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Council | Law L24-0140, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008344, Expires on Feb 10, 2023 |
2022-05-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-05-13 | Council | Act A24-0406 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005063 |
2022-05-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-05-09 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0406 |
2022-04-25 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 9, 2022 |
2022-04-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-04-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0745 Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | First Reading |
2022-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |