DC B24-0722 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0216, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0216, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-722 would designate the park in Lots 800 and 807 in Square 748, bounded by L Street, N.E., 2nd Street, N.E., M Street, N.E., and 3rd Street, N.E. in Ward 6, as Swampoodle Terrace.
Title
Swampoodle Terrace Designation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0216, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000012 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0608 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013960 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0608 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0722 |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0722 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |