DC B24-0715 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-27 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-27 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2023 Federal Portion Budget Request Act of 2022
Title
Fiscal Year 2023 Federal Portion Budget Request Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-07-22 | Council | Act A24-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008864 |
2022-07-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0485 |
2022-07-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 19, 2022 |
2022-05-24 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-05-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0715 |
2022-04-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0715 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |