DC B24-0714 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0167, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0167, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2023 Budget Support Act of 2022
Title
Fiscal Year 2023 Budget Support Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Allen, Henderson, Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Allen, Henderson, Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - RECONSIDERATION (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - RECONSIDERATION (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Allen, Henderson, Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Allen, Henderson, Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Bonds, Cheh, Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - RECONSIDERATION (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - RECONSIDERATION (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0167, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011937 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009223 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0492 |
2022-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2022 |
2022-06-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Cheh, Pinto) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Pinto) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Bonds) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Bonds, Cheh, Pinto) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Bonds, Allen, Henderson, Mendelson) |
2022-06-07 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (Pinto) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0714 |
2022-05-10 | Council | RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-10 | Council | First Reading |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (Allen and Nadeau) |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (L. George) - Not Considered |
2022-05-10 | Council | Amendment (L. George) - Not Considered |
2022-04-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0714 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |