DC B24-0708 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-708 would establish requirements prohibiting employers from posting a job advertisement without including the minimum and maximum salary or hourly pay information.
Title
Pay Range Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0708 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2022-03-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0708 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49006/Introduction/B24-0708-Introduction.pdf |