DC B24-0706 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0215, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0215, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-706 would allow the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability (“BEGA”) to retain funds resulting from ethics and open meetings violations under its jurisdiction. It would allow the Central Collection Unit (“CCU”) to collect delinquent debt on BEGA’s behalf and deposit the funds into the Ethics Fund or the Open Government Fund, instead of the General Fund. The delinquent debt that is recovered and transferred to BEGA will supplement the agency’s operating budget by providing additional special purposes revenue to support its operations and personnel.
Title
Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Delinquent Debt Recovery Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0215, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000011 |
2022-11-18 | Council | Act A24-0620 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014175 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0620 |
2022-10-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0706 |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-07-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-07-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0706 |
2022-04-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0706 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2022-03-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |