DC B24-0705 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Law L24-0149, Effective from Aug 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011395, Expires on Mar 25, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Law L24-0149, Effective from Aug 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011395, Expires on Mar 25, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Council | Law L24-0149, Effective from Aug 12, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011395, Expires on Mar 25, 2023 |
2022-05-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-05-13 | Council | Act A24-0403 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005042 |
2022-05-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-05-09 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0403 |
2022-04-25 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 9, 2022 |
2022-04-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0705 Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-03-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |