DC B24-0666 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-666 would require realtors to use up-to-date soil surveys from the Natural Resources Conservation Service. District law requires that all real estate contracts contain information regarding the characteristic of the soil on the property.
Title
Soil Disclosures Modernization Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Mendelson Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Mendelson Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0736 |
2022-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2023 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-06 | Council | Mendelson Amendment |
2022-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-15 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0666 |
2022-10-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0666 |
2022-10-19 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-05 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-05-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-04-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-03-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0666 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-02-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |