DC B24-0665 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-665 would require DCPS to allow students participating in a homeschool program to sit for an AP exams at the school that the student could attend of-right or a reasonable alternate location, where the student’s of-right school will not be offering that particular AP exams. Among other things, it requires OSSE to confirm for DCPS that the student is in fact participating in a homeschool program, has received a request to register for AP exams, and meets all other eligibility requirements.
Title
Access to Advanced Placement Exams Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Mendelson Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Mendelson Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0705 |
2022-12-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 4, 2023 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Mendelson Amendment |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-15 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0665 |
2022-09-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0665 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |