DC B24-0656 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-656 would allow the Court to order DNA testing when requested by certain individuals even if a person has executed a valid acknowledgment of paternity or when there is a prior judicial finding of paternity.
Title
Paternity Establishment Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0643 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014630 |
2022-11-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-21 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0643 |
2022-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2022 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0656 |
2022-09-26 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-06-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0656 Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-02-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |