DC B24-0653 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-653 would require the provision of free period products in District buildings and government operated spaces.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Period Equity Righting an Injustice of District Residents Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-16 | Council | Act A24-0687 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015101 |
2022-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0687 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 12, 2022 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0653 |
2022-10-20 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Cancelled |
2022-07-05 | Council | Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed |
2022-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration |
2022-02-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0653 Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |