DC B24-0637 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Act A24-0347 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002616, Expires on Jun 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Act A24-0347 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002616, Expires on Jun 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Redistricting Deadline Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Redistricting Deadline Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Council - Postponed to March 1, 2022 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Council - Postponed to March 1, 2022 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Council | Act A24-0347 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002616, Expires on Jun 26, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-03-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0347, Expires on Jun 26, 2022 |
2022-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 28, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) |
2022-03-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-02-15 | Council | Postponed to March 1, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Postponed to February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |