DC B24-0615 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0212, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0212, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-615 would enhance the District’s paid family leave program to provide for personal medical leave and pre-natal leave, expand the length of paid leave for qualifying family and parental leave events, clarify the sequence of medical leave and sick leave, and provide that family and medical leave may be exercised during a 12-month period following the start of the qualifying event.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement.
Title
District Government Paid Leave Enhancement Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0212, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000008 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0607 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013950 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0607 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-07-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-07-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0615 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-02-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2022-01-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0615 Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |