DC B24-0611 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Act A24-0322 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001050, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Act A24-0322 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001050, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Returning to School Safely Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Returning to School Safely Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Council - R. White (Amendment) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - R. White (Amendment) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - R. White (Amendment) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Council | Act A24-0322 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001050, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |
2022-02-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0322, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 7, 2022 |
2022-01-18 | Council | R. White (Amendment) |
2022-01-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-01-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |