DC B24-0576 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Act A24-0264 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000001, Expires on Mar 29, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Act A24-0264 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000001, Expires on Mar 29, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ward Redistricting Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Ward Redistricting Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Oral amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Oral amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Oral amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Council | Act A24-0264 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000001, Expires on Mar 29, 2022 |
2021-12-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0264, Expires on Mar 29, 2022 |
2021-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Oral amendment (P. Mendelson) |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |