DC B24-0570 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-570 would revise school budgeting for the District of Columbia Public Schools by budgeting the local schools first based on each school’s previous year’s budget, with the remainder to be allocated between central administration and school support.
Title
Schools First In Budgeting Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - Agendized; not considered at the request of (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - Agendized; not considered at the request of (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 23, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2022-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0570 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Chairman Mendelson |
2022-09-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0570 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-12-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |