DC B24-0565 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-565 would require a traffic signal or all-way stop at every local intersection within a quarter mile of a school. It also includes mandates for raised crosswalks, curb extensions, crosswalk warning pylons, flashing pedestrian signs and speed bumps in the vicinity of the school. Among other things it would expand school safety zones and require automated traffic cameras within each school zone.
Title
Safe Routes to School Expansion Regulation Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-02-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0565 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-12-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0565 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48449/Introduction/B24-0565-Introduction.pdf |