DC B24-0555 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-555 would extend, by more than 20 years, the term of an existing lease agreement of District-owned real property located at 200 Douglas Street, NE, Washington, D.C., commonly known as the Shaed School.
Title
Shaed School Disposition Extension Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-12-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0555 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0555 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48418/Introduction/B24-0555-Introduction.pdf |