DC B24-0554 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-554 would require the Mayor to engage the public for review and comment, via public hearing, and also to submit to the Council for review and approval by resolution, all exclusive use or license agreements for District-owned recreational property that cover a period of one year or more.
Title
Fairness in Use and Negotiation for All Recreational Property Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0554 |
2022-11-08 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0554 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0554 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48392/Introduction/B24-0554-Introduction.pdf |